THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:04:39 PM
Nesterenko, Maria
CPSO#:
89098
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Crimean State Medical University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
243 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M4R 1B1
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA NESTERENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESTERENKO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |