THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:30:08 AM
Nguyen, Hong Chau
CPSO#:
88893
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-7321
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Oct 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HONG CHAU NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 22 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2011 |