THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:29:07 PM
Sandhu, Navneet Kaur
CPSO#:
87962
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Chahal, Navneet Kaur (used until: 10 Apr 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: J. J. M. Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
520 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON N2T 2Z6
Phone: (519) 743-3641
Fax: (519) 743-1042
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 May 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVNEET KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jan 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2111 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2008 |