THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:13:47 AM
McCormick, Lindsay Anne
CPSO#:
87384
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sit, Lindsay Anne (used until: 20 Apr 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L. Sit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013
Corporation Name: Lindsay McCormick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 25 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean, ON
K2H8P4
Date Received: 19 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:20 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 May 2022 |