THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:52:10 PM
Lagman-Bartolome, Ana Marissa Dizon
CPSO#:
86160
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: Angeles University Foundatio, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
Children's Hospital London Health S
Pediatric Neurology
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 57455
Fax: 5196858350
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:14 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANA MARISSA DIZON LAGMAN-BARTOLOME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGMAN-BARTOLOME is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2015 |