THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:15:14 PM
Tang, Shangguo
CPSO#:
85245
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Luzhou Medical College, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pathology
2N27 Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main St., West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42019
Fax: (905) 521-2338
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:15 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANGGUO TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2009 |