THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:46:59 AM
Nagarajan, Naveen Parasu
CPSO#:
85189
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Campus
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42562
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:26 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVEEN PARASU NAGARAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGARAJAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 13 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 14 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2009 |