THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:20:30 AM
Slomovic, Brant Michael
CPSO#:
85095
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medi, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
G-480
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:22 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRANT MICHAEL SLOMOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOMOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2008 |