THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:13:00 PM
Alexander, Amy Leann Elizabeth
CPSO#:
85083
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Andrews, Amy Leann Elizabeth (used until: 05 Apr 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Psychosocial Onc/Palliative Care
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6080
Fax: (905) 952-3050
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMY LEANN ELIZABETH ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2009 |