THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:37:19 AM
Aggarwal, Aaron Neil
CPSO#:
85075
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Limestone City Sleep Lab
Suite 110
920 Princess Street
Kingston ON K7L 1H1
Phone: (613) 547-9172
Fax: (613) 547-9910
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:28 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARON NEIL AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Jul 2006 to 04 Aug 2006
EL - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2009 |