THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:48:44 AM
Gonzalez Lejarza, Rogelio Efrain
CPSO#:
85035
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571
Fax: 905 845 6419
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Gonzalez Lejarza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROGELIO EFRAIN GONZALEZ LEJARZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ LEJARZA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Sep 2006
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 13 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2014 |