THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:15:31 AM
AlKudmani, Amer Subhi B
CPSO#:
85015
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Al-Kudmani, Aamir Sabhi B (used until: 09 Jun 2011 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Jun 2006 to 10 Sep 2006
PEAP - R - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2012 |