THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:01:37 PM
Jassam, Jabir Mohammed
CPSO#:
84994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Mosul, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medhaven Medical Center
Unit 104
10 Green Street
Ottawa ON K2J 3Z6
Phone: (613) 825-0544
Fax: (613) 825-0543
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JABIR MOHAMMED JASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASSAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2007 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2009 |