THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 0:05:36 AM
Maxwell, Timothy John
CPSO#:
84966
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Timothy J. Maxwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |