THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:20:12 PM
Sadaf, Arifa
CPSO#:
84950
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Punjab, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7111 Syntex Drive, 3rd Floor
Mississauga ON L5N 8C3
Phone: 905-362-0223
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:10 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARIFA SADAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADAF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Jun 2006 to 23 Jul 2006
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 24 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Sep 2007
Research Fellows - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 2007 to 02 Nov 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2012 |