THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:07:50 PM
Carr, Megan Rebecca
CPSO#:
84916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hogan, Megan Rebecca (used until: 17 Dec 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
690 Dorval Dr
Suite 201-A
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Phone: 365-333-3376
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEGAN REBECCA CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2008 |