THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:59:54 AM
Chawla, Anjana
CPSO#:
84905
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 905 683 2320 Ext. 14205
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANJANA CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2006 to 16 Oct 2006
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2007 |