THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:02:20 AM
Ahmed, Sabera
CPSO#:
84893
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Dhaka, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Phone: 9056323000
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sabera Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 28 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Aug 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SABERA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2008 |