THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:59:52 PM
Khalil, Raghad
CPSO#:
84892
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAGHAD KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
AVP - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 15 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2012 |