THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:30:10 PM
Salja Halili, Elvira
CPSO#:
84881
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Albanian, Bosnian, Croatian, English
Education: UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
PO Box 772
Morrisburg ON K0C 1X0
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Fax: (613) 543-4171
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELVIRA SALJA HALILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALJA HALILI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |