THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:05:01 PM
Church, Alanna Joyce
CPSO#:
84861
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Department of Pathology, Boston Children's Hospital, 300 Longwood Avenue, Boston, MA, USA, 02115
Date Received: 19 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:24 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |