THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:50:22 AM
Haider, Ehsan Ahmed Hussain
CPSO#:
84853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Radiology
50 Charlton Ave. E., Rm. T0733
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 37326
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahrain
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital |
Sioux Lookout |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Sydenham District Hospital |
Wallaceburg |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EHSAN AHMED HUSSAIN HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2007 |