THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:06:41 AM
Aggarwal, Anita
CPSO#:
84838
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Gulbarga University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Medicine
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Jun 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2010 |
|
Active |