THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:46:24 AM
Pell, Tripler
CPSO#:
84827
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Brown University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Phone: 4169211066
Fax: (416) 921-8459
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Mar 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TRIPLER PELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |