THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:36:52 PM
Warman Chardon, Jodi
CPSO#:
84791
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
Mailbox 211
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16221
Fax: (613) 761-5403
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jodi Warman Chardon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 4 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:24 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JODI WARMAN CHARDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARMAN CHARDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 13 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2014 |