THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:21:15 AM
Wanes Hana, Maha Ramses
CPSO#:
84762
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2670 County Road 43
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-2486
Fax: (613) 258-4183
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHA RAMSES WANES HANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANES HANA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 09 Apr 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2011 |