THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:40:05 PM
Sandoz, Jacqueline Susanne
CPSO#:
84745
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
The Rehabilitation Centre
1201-505 Smyth Road
CANVent Respiratory Services
Ottawa ON K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75318
Fax: 6137369054
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:03 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SUSANNE SANDOZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDOZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jan 2015
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2012 |