THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:34:46 AM
Abu-Abed, Suzan
CPSO#:
84737
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1952 Bay St
Royal Jubilee Hospital
Department of Anatomic Pathology
Victoria BC V8R 1J8
Phone: (604)788-1377
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Suzan Abu-Abed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |