THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:49:57 AM
Yang, Simon Yie
CPSO#:
84729
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
141 Main St
Unionville ON L3R 2G7
Phone: 9054775935
Fax: 9054775936
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIMON YIE YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2012 |