THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:30:39 PM
Topic, Delilah Lisa
CPSO#:
84715
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
BC Cancer Agency
399 Royal Avenue
Kelowna BC V1Y 5L3
Phone: (250) 712-3930
Fax: (250) 712-3911
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DELILAH LISA TOPIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOPIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2010 |