THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:01:50 AM
Srigley, Jocelyn Andyss
CPSO#:
84706
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jocelyn Srigley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:BC Children's Hospital
Laboratory Medicine
Room 2J3
4500 Oak Street
Vancouver BC V6H 3N1
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |