THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 15:52:52 PM
Clapham, Diane
CPSO#:
84704
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Slosarz, Diane (used until: 27 Jul 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 16 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |