THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:59:48 PM
MacIsaac, Jennifer Lynn
CPSO#:
84679
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105A
460 West Hunt Club
Ottawa ON K2E 0B8
Phone: (613) 369-8369
Fax: (613) 369-8354
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MACISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACISAAC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2008 |