THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:19:32 AM
Doherty, Colleen Elizabeth
CPSO#:
84649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PATH Clinic
Suite 200
30 Prospect St
Newmarket ON L3Y 3S9
Phone: 905-235-7284
Fax: 905-235-7320
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Colleen Doherty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 5 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLLEEN ELIZABETH DOHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOHERTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |