THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:54:49 AM
Dhillon, Gagandeep Singh
CPSO#:
84648
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |