THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:26:06 PM
Barron, Jacquelyn Alexandra
CPSO#:
84627
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
5th Floor
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Fax: (416) 469-6805
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELYN ALEXANDRA BARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2014 |