THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:52:45 PM
Shourideh-Ziabari, Sayed Mostafa Amir
CPSO#:
84622
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Shouridh-Ziabary, Sayed Mostafa (used until: 04 Dec 2007 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: (705) 734-6284
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jul 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAYED MOSTAFA AMIR SHOURIDEH-ZIABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOURIDEH-ZIABARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2008 |