THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:39:39 AM
Wentlandt, Kirsten
CPSO#:
84620
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN WENTLANDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WENTLANDT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 29 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2009 |