THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:56:43 AM
Al-Douri, Faten M
CPSO#:
81593
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Saddam College of Medicine, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36009
Fax: (905) 521-6063
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FATEN M AL-DOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DOURI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2009 |