THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:29:04 PM
Boparai, Dennis Kiranpal S
CPSO#:
81452
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DENNIS KIRANPAL S BOPARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOPARAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2010 |