THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:38:43 PM
Safir, Oleg Aleksandrovich
CPSO#:
79962
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
476A - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 2529
Fax: (647) 826-8019
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLEG ALEKSANDROVICH SAFIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 09 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2005 to 26 Jan 2006
International Specialist Physician - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2008 |