THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:34:08 PM
Boylan, Colm Edmund
CPSO#:
78775
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33152
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Colm Boylan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2007
Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 20 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:19 Aug 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
|
Active |