THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:25:21 AM
Davies, Timothy Owen
CPSO#:
77744
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304-1221 Algonquin Ave
Urology North
North Bay ON P1B 4Y3
Phone: 705-995-2490
Fax: 705-478-6507
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY OWEN DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2009 |