THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:29:10 AM
Ferguson, Kimberley Adele
CPSO#:
76506
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5424
Fax: (844) 847-8841
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ADELE FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2003 |