THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:10:28 AM
Ali, Fahim Husayn
CPSO#:
76181
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 840-2475
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAHIM HUSAYN ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2020 |