THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:27:43 AM
Soon, Shawn Jay
CPSO#:
76165
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Mandarin
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3410 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON M1T 3K4
Phone: 416-628-4997
Fax: 416-850-4146
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWN JAY SOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2007 |