THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:17:41 PM
Lakhanpal, Neeraj
CPSO#:
74502
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jul 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEERAJ LAKHANPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANPAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 03 Feb 2000 to 16 Feb 2000
EL - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 26 May 2000 to 21 Jun 2000
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 25 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Feb 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2000 |