THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:01:39 AM
Randhawa, Harkamal Kaur
CPSO#:
74322
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON L8P 3A4
Phone: (289) 389-8900
Fax: (289) 389-7700
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 May 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HARKAMAL KAUR RANDHAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDHAWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 1999 to 31 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2000 to 31 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2003 |