THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:19:36 AM
Prakash, Suma
CPSO#:
73417
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Kannada, Spanish
Education: University of Ottawa, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
601 Elmwood Ave
PO Box 675
Department of Medicine, Division of
Rochester ON 14642-0002
United States
Phone: 585-274-0202
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:15 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUMA PRAKASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAKASH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2004 |