THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:24:11 AM
Rutherford, Michael Nevin
CPSO#:
67926
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 May 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 May 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematopathology
The Ottawa Hospital
3rd Floor, Rm. M3887b, Box #115
Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L6
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 79863
Fax: 613-739-6786
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NEVIN RUTHERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTHERFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 2000 |